FL H0271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions authorizing mobile home park owner to increase rental amount paid by purchaser of mobile home following expiration of assumed rental agreement; allows mobile home park owner to require purchaser to enter into new tenancy under new rental agreement & prospectus upon expiration of assumed rental agreement if prospectus & rental agreement are delivered to purchaser before occupancy.
Title
Mobile Home Park Tenancies
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 28 | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 28 | |
2011-10-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/271 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0271/BillText/Filed/HTML |