FL H0271 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Status: Introduced on October 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-22 - Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Summary
Prohibits engaging in certain activities to deprive another of his or her right of honest services; provides for construction in accordance with specified federal law.
Title
Offenses by Public Officials or Others
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Kiar [D] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | Withdrawn from Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Rules and Calendar Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0444 (Similar To) 2010-03-03 - Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Ethics and Elections; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00182; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00182
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0271&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |