FL H0267 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands existing public records exemption to include information identifying pregnant minor that is contained in court records relating to such minor's petition to waive consent requirements to obtain abortion; provides for future legislative review & repeal of expanded exemption; provides for reversion of specified language if exemption is not saved from repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Abortion
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 406 |
2020-02-19 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 406 |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-10-22 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 10/22/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-10-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H265 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 404
S406 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-148
S404 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-147
S406 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-148
S404 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-147
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/267 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/267/BillText/Filed/PDF |