FL H0263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that responsibility for paying expenses of medical care for person ill or injured during or as result of his or her arrest is responsibility of person receiving medical care; requires each in-custody pretrial detainee or sentenced inmate who receives medical care or services to cooperate with detention facility in seeking reimbursement; provides that, absent written agreement, remuneration be at rate not to exceed specified percent of Medicare allowable rate; requires each in-custody pretrial detainee or sentenced inmate who has health insurance or benefits to assign such benefits to health care provider; provides that law enforcement or detention facility personnel are responsible for restricting personal freedom of certain in-custody pretrial detainees or sentenced inmates; provides that act does not apply to certain counties; provides that certain charter counties are not obligated to reimburse any third-party provider for in-custody pretrial detainee or sentenced inmate of county detention facility at rate exceeding particular rate for certain costs.
Title
Financial Responsibility for Medical Expenses of Pretrial Detainees or Sentenced Inmates
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 27 | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 27 | |
2011-10-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
901 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/263 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0263/BillText/Filed/HTML |