FL H0261 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislature to fund FEFP at level that ensures guaranteed minimum annual starting salary for instructional personnel; specifies statewide minimum salary for 2015-2016 fiscal year; requires DOE to annually adjust minimum starting salary; requires district school boards to adjust minimum starting salary.
Title
Teacher Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0280 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/261 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0261/BillText/Filed/PDF |