FL H0259 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for comprehensive health education in public schools to include information regarding child abuse & human trafficking; removes certain requirements for health education; provides exemption to portions of health education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Health in Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#243 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (851627)
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-04-01HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-04-01HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-20HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseCS referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-20HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-03-20HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-19HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HousePCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S982 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003453Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback