FL H0259 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain organizations to establish programs to provide temporary respite care for child by volunteer respite family; provides requirements for & limitations to such programs.
Title
Temporary Care of a Child
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] |
Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#653 (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 87 NAYS 27 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/04/16, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-28 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2016-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/16, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-20 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-13 | House | CS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-12-01 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-12-01 | House | CS referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2015-11-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-18 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 4 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/18/15, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-09-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1102 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
709 | 2209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |