FL H0247 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish grant program for prevention, care, & treatment of sickle cell disease or sickle cell trait or sickle cell trait carriers & for educational programs & develop application criteria & standards of eligibility for such program; requires department to develop & maintain voluntary registry & to conduct specified study; provides rulemaking authority to department.
Title
Sickle Cell Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-10 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-30 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-29 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-29 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1408 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages