FL H0247 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces tax levied on rent or license fees charged for use of real property.
Title
Taxes on Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2015-09-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0116 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
H7099 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Chapter No. 2016-220, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 698 (Ch. 2016-190)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/247 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0247/BillText/Filed/PDF |