FL H0247 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida for Life Act"; prohibits induced abortions; prohibits operation of facility for purpose of providing abortion services; prohibits termination of pregnancy unless specified conditions are met; requires informed consent; provides standard of care if fetus is viable; requires that fetal remains be disposed of according to specified standards; provides restrictions on use of state & federal funds for state exchanges that provide coverage for induced abortions & termination of pregnancies under certain conditions.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1502 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6699 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 66996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
743 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
743 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/247 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0247/BillText/Filed/PDF |