FL H0243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises duties & responsibilities of DOH with respect to production & maintenance of death certificates & burial transit permits; requires electronic filing & transmission of certain death records.
Title
Vital Statistics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#110 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#110 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Chapter No. 2015-105 | |
2015-06-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 640 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-06 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15 |
2015-03-03 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-02-03 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/15, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0640 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 243 (Ch. 2015-105)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
382 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |