FL H0243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes collection of tangible personal property tax recovery fee by person engaging in business of renting or leasing heavy equipment; provides requirements for collection & retention; prohibits additional recoupment of recovery fee in current year under certain circumstances; requires reduction in amount of recoupment of recovery fee for following year under certain circumstances.
Title
Tangible Personal Property Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#346 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 862 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 617 | |
2011-04-12 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -HJ 618 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 04/12/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-09 | Now in Finance and Tax Committee -HJ 188 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 26 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 26 | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0384 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration