FL H0239 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter No. 2017-14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for petitions, & contents thereof, for certain protective injunctions that are dismissed in certain circumstances; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records/Protective Injunction Petitions
Sponsors
House Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee | Rep. Larry Lee [D] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] | Rep. Kionne McGhee [D] |
Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Chapter No. 2017-14 | |
2017-05-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-19 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2017-04-19 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1062 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-05 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/04/17 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/23/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-13 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-20 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-16 | House | CS by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 02/16/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1062 (Similar To) 2017-04-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 239 (Ch. 2017-14)