FL H0237 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Driving Under the Influence of Drugs (DUID) Act"; provides that person with specified amount of delta 9 tetrahydrocannabinol per milliliter of blood commits offense of driving under influence or boating under influence.
Title
Driving or Boating Under the Influence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/237 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0237/BillText/Filed/PDF |