FL H0233 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Division of Alcoholic Beverages & Tobacco of DBPR to issue alcoholic beverage license to City of Tampa to use within Curtis Hixon Waterfront Park & Kiley Garden Park; provides that license may be used only for special events; provides for payment of license fee; prohibits sales for consumption off premises; authorizes transfer & provides for subsequent reversion of license under certain circumstances.
Title
City of Tampa, Hillsborough County
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] | Rep. Betty Reed [D] | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#58 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#321 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#321 (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1002 | |
2011-05-02 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 648 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Local Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-28 | Received -SJ 572 | |
2011-04-27 | In Messages | |
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -HJ 825 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 259 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 26 | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 151 | |
2011-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 02/23/11, 1:00 pm, 116 Knott Building | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 26 | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0756 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration