FL H0225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits employer from taking retaliatory personnel action against employee for evacuating under emergency evacuation order; provides exceptions; provides for remedies, relief, & attorney fees & costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Discrimination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-10-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1828 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback