FL H0225 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines term "original ticket seller"; requires original ticket seller to provide advance public notice of ticket policies for any event that takes place in facility that receives public funding; provides requirements for such notice; requires original ticket seller to comply with specified consumer protection standards for any event that takes place in facility that receives public funding; requires each required public notice of event ticket practices to be accompanied by specified certification; prohibits specified practices by original ticket sellers; provides that specified violations are violation of Florida Deceptive & Unfair Trade Practices Act; provides exceptions.
Title
Ticket Sales
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 24 | |
2011-11-29 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 12/06/11, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-10-17 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 24 | |
2011-09-28 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/225 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0225/BillText/Filed/HTML |