FL H0223 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exceptions to definition of term "change of ownership" for purposes of certain homestead assessment limitation; provides that person or family unit receiving or claiming benefit of certain ad valorem tax exemptions or tax credits in another state is not entitled to homestead exemption unless person or family unit demonstrates to property appraiser that certain conditions have been met; provides that homestead exemption forms prescribed by DOR may include taxpayer information relating to ad valorem tax exemptions or tax credits in another state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#482 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Community Affairs
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-03-03SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/13/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-29HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-28HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2020-01-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-27HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 01/27/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23HouseNow in Ways and Means Committee
2019-10-23HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-10-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 10/23/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-09-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S514 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
193155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
196121Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback