FL H0223 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends Medicaid eligibility to specified adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility for Medical Assistance and Related Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S126 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409904Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback