FL H0223 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for recovery through surcharge of costs for water & wastewater system improvement projects; requires PSC approval of surcharge; limits surcharge amount; provides requirements for surcharge billing, reconciliation, & adjustment; provides project eligibility criteria; provides requirements for notice, maintenance, & availability of certain records; provides that surcharges are subject to refund under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and Wastewater Utilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-24 Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 311
2011-03-23 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-03-15 CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 259
2011-03-11 PCS on Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/15/11, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 25
2011-02-01 Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 25
2011-01-18 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0950 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3670819Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback