FL H0223 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - Withdrawn from Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00027

Summary

Revises definition of "child care personnel" to include persons who work in summer 24-hour camps; requires summer day camps & summer 24-hour camps to be licensed by DCFS & requires employees thereof to undergo level 2 background screening; repeals exemption from fingerprinting requirements for summer camp personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection of Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-26 Withdrawn from Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00027
2009-11-01 Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council
2009-10-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7069 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-114; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
S1520 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted (886258, 636420, 348828, 343964) -SJ 00959; Substituted CS/HB 7069 -SJ 00960; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162) -SJ 00960

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0402302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04091758Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback