FL H0219 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric utilities to collect monthly systems charge from residential, commercial, & industrial customers; provides for deposit of collected funds into Sustainable & Renewable Energy Policy Trust Fund; creates direct-support organization for Florida Energy & Climate Commission; requires contract between office & direct-support organization; provides for use of funds; requires annual audit, etc.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 24 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 25 | |
2011-01-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0282 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0221 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0156 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0284 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0221 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0156 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S0284 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/219 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0219/BillText/Filed/HTML |