FL H0219 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits agencies from entering into contract for contractual services with contractors not registered & participating in federal work authorization program by specified date; provides procedures & requirements with respect to registration of contractors & subcontractors; provides for enforcement; provides schedule for phased compliance, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0965 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Messages
2010-04-26 In Messages
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01062; CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 01063
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00951; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00951
2010-04-19 CS read 1st time on 04/19/10 -HJ 00758; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00789
2010-04-16 CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00762
2010-04-15 On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-29 Original reference(s) removed: Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; CS referred to Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00424; Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2010-03-26 CS read 1st time on 03/26/10 -HJ 00402; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-24 CS by Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00408
2010-03-22 PCS on Committee agenda-- Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/24/10, 8:00 am, 306-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00026
2009-11-01 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Policy Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-10-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0421 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S0856 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
S1880 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
002340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0024115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
02870575New CodeSee Bill Text
0337163New CodeSee Bill Text
09430311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
095130New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0219&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb021900.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb021901c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb021902c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb021903e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB02190426100965.html

Bill Comments

feedback