FL H0217 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program within FDLE; requires FDLE to contract with corporation not for profit to administer & manage program; provides requirements for disbursement of funds for veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs; places annual cap on funds available for care of eligible retired law enforcement dog; prohibits former handler or adopter from receiving reimbursement if funds are depleted for year for which such reimbursement is sought; provides for administrative fees; provides appropriation.
Title
Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-09 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-11-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 11/04/15, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0440 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages