FL H0213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain actions creating restrictions or issuance of licenses are subject to penalties under specified provisions; provides that Cabinet member may not make any administrative regulations concerning regulation of firearms & ammunition except as expressly provided by State Constitution or general law; requires DACS to enforce state firearms laws.
Title
Regulation of Concealed Weapons and Firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture and Flooding Subcommittee; Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/213 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/213/BillText/Filed/PDF |