FL H0213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Chapter No. 2015-87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that property appraiser's budget shall be funded once DOR makes its final budget amendments; obligates county commission to fund DOR's final property appraiser budget during pendency of appeal to Administration Commission.
Title
Property Appraisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Chapter No. 2015-87 | |
2015-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for SB 266 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/15 |
2015-03-17 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15 |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-05 | House | Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/05/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-12 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/12/15, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0266 (Same As) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 213 (Ch. 2015-87)