FL H0213 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "premark"; revises notification & marking procedures for proposed excavation or demolition; creates noncriminal infraction for failure by excavator to notify member operator of planned start date & time of specified excavation; deletes certain notification exemptions; revises excavators' premarking requirements; revises definition of term "high-priority subsurface installation"; authorizes member operator to deem owned or operated underground pipeline or facility high-priority subsurface installation; requires excavator to notify member operator of current & accurate contact information; revises requirement to report certain infractions; authorizes settlement of incident by payment of fine.
Title
Underground Facility Damage Prevention & Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2014-02-04 | House | Withdrawn from Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 02/05/14, 9:30 am, Webster Hall --Removed from meeting agenda |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-10-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0288 (Same As) 2014-02-07 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
337 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/213 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0213/BillText/Filed/PDF |