FL H0205 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOC & Parole Commission to establish agreements to implement federal deportation program for state inmates; revises provisions relating to Control Release Authority; requires authority to implement program to execute immediate deportation; authorizes authority to extend or advance control release date for transfer of custody pending deportation; requires DOC to identify inmates eligible for control release for removal & deportation at reception, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Illegal or Undocumented Aliens

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 23
2011-01-25 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 23
2011-01-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0304 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
947146Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback