FL H0201 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act the "Arthur Green, Jr., Act"; requires FDLE to establish online continued employment training component relating to diabetic emergencies; specifies topics to be included; provides that completion of training may count towards continued employment instruction requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diabetes Awareness Training for Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#237 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-168
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-23HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-23SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 746
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-22SenateReceived
2015-04-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-22SenateIn Messages
2015-04-22HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 1
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-02HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2015-03-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/02/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-16HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-16HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2015-03-16HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-13HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-13HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-12HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-10HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0746 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 201 (Ch. 2015-168)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9431726Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback