FL H0199 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "step therapy"; prohibits health insurers & health maintenance organizations from requiring insureds or subscribers to repeat step therapy protocols; provides that certain health insurers & health maintenance organizations may impose specified requirement for continued coverage; provides that such entities are not required to take specified actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Step Therapy Protocols

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-05HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-02HouseCS/CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS/CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-09-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S98 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62742392Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62742393Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276476Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641317Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback