FL H0197 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to create term limits for Supreme Court justices & judges of DCAs; limits applicability to justices & judges appointed after effective date.
Title
Term Limits for Appellate Courts
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. John Wood [R] | Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R] | Rep. Neil Combee [R] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Rep. John Tobia [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#598 (Y: 76 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#597 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#584 (Y: 5 N: 98 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#597 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#584 (Y: 5 N: 98 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2016-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 76 NAYS 38 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-04 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 |
2016-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/04/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/21/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-09 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2015-11-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-11-03 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 5 |
2015-10-27 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/03/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0322 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary