FL H0197 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies order for applying tax credit for employment of homeless; redefines term "adjusted federal income" to include adjustment for tax credit; provides definitions; provides tax credit for corporation hiring homeless person who resides in transitional, permanent supportive, or permanent housing facility; specifies information to be provided to DOR when applying for credit; provides for unused credit carryover; requires filing application with DOR by specified date annually; provides penalties for fraudulently claiming tax credit. etc.
Title
Employment of the Homeless
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Reggie Fullwood [D] | Rep. John Julien [D] | Rep. Rick Kriseman [D] |
Rep. Mark Pafford [D] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 23 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 23 | |
2011-01-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0266 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/197 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0197/BillText/Filed/HTML |