FL H0191 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits use of electronic communications devices by certain drivers; provides for voluntary checkoff on driver license applications to permit contributions to AAA Foundation for Traffic Safety.
Title
Traffic Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2015-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0460 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0740 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
S0740 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/191 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0191/BillText/Filed/PDF |