FL H0189 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides alternative requirements for earning professional educator certificate covering certain grades.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher Certification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#570 (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28 Chapter No. 2016-117
2016-03-25 Approved by Governor
2016-03-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2016-03-10HouseOrdered enrolled
2016-03-10SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
2016-03-10SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-09SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-09SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 432
2016-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-03-09SenateWithdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2016-02-23SenateReceived
2016-02-23SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2016-02-23SenateIn Messages
2016-02-18HouseCS passed; YEAS 100 NAYS 11
2016-02-18HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-17HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-02-17HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16
2016-01-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-14HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2016-01-12HouseCS by K-12 Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-12-03HouseNow in Education Committee
2015-12-02HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-12-02HouseCS by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-11-25HousePCS on Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 12/02/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-09-24HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-09-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0432 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 189 (Ch. 2016-117)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012571Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback