FL H0189 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 374 (Ch. 2014-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 374 (Ch. 2014-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising restrictions on initiative or referendum process in regard to local comprehensive plan amendments & map amendments.
Title
Growth Management
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Boyd [D] | Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 374 (Ch. 2014-178) |
2014-04-29 | House | Substituted SB 374 |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/14 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-13 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/12/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-04 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Favorable by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 02/04/14, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-10-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0374 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-178
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/189 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0189/BillText/Filed/PDF |