FL H0189 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Supports establishment of Free Trade Agreements between United States & Colombia, Panama, & Republic of Korea.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Free Trade Agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-28 In Messages
2011-04-28 Read 2nd time -HJ 886
2011-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11
2011-04-01 Placed on Calendar -HJ 399
2011-03-31 Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 399
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/31/11, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2011-03-16 Favorable by Federal Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 251
2011-03-14 On Committee agenda-- Federal Affairs Subcommittee, 03/16/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 22
2011-01-25 Referred to Federal Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 22
2011-01-13 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback