FL H0187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to remove authority for the Miami-Dade County charter to provide for choosing a property appraiser in a manner other than by election or to alter the duties of the property appraiser or abolish the office of the property appraiser, etc.
Title
Selection and Duties of Property Appraiser/Miami-Dade County Charter
Sponsors
House Government Accountability Committee | House Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#343 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 20 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (420557) |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 5 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-21 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/16/17, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0087 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S0136 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S130 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S132 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S134 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S138 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H271 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H571 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H721 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
H1129 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S0136 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S130 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S132 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S134 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
S138 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Withdrawn from further consideration
H271 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H571 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H721 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar
H1129 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee