FL H0187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "Florida's One-Stop Business Connect Act"; requires Governor to direct certain state agencies to jointly conduct review of state's requirements for starting, licensing, & operating business & examine feasibility of establishing single online portal for accessing such requirements; provides review requirements; requires Governor to submit report & recommendations to Legislature by specified date.
Title
Issuance of Licenses/Certifications/Registrations
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Ahern [R] | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Rep. Esteban Bovo [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
House Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee | Rep. Bill Hager [R] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#366 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-28 | In Messages | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 886 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/11 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 618 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 618 | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 601 | |
2011-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/08/11, 8:45 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-21 | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 265 | |
2011-03-18 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-15 | CS by Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 259 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/15/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 22 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 22 | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0798 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration