FL H0185 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 306 (Ch. 2023-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 306 (Ch. 2023-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person who is not registered secondary metals recycler from purchasing detached catalytic converter; requires recycler to comply with specified requirements; prohibits person from possessing, purchasing, selling, or installing stolen, altered, or detached catalytic converter; provides for inference that catalytic converter may have been stolen; prohibits import, manufacture, specified purchase, sale, or installation of counterfeit, fake, or nonfunctional catalytic converter; prohibits recycler from processing or removing detached catalytic converter from recycler's place of business for specified period; provides exceptions.
Title
Catalytic Converters
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Fred Hawkins [R] | Rep. Joseph Casello [D] | Rep. Alina Garcia [R] |
Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. Katherine Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 306 (Ch. 2023-114) |
2023-04-18 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 306 |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023) |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-21 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2023-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-08 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S306 (Similar To) 2023-05-25 - Chapter No. 2023-114
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
538 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
860 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |