FL H0183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schedules Mitragynine & 7-Hydroxymitragynine, constituents of Kratom, in schedule of controlled substances; provides exception from scheduling for drug product approved by USDA which contains Mitragynine or 7-Hydroxymitragynine; reenacts related provisions.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] | Rep. Mike Miller [R] | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Rep. Charlie Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0424 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 2616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 563 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
831 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
856 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 0356 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/183 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0183/BillText/Filed/PDF |