FL H0181 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Sunshine Scholarship program; provides program & student requirements; provides for funding & rulemaking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunshine Scholarship Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseCS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-08HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-12-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-12-06HouseCS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-11-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 4:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-09-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S646 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S794 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009894Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback