FL H0179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for relief of Stephen & Meredith Kirby, parents & natural guardians of daughter, Harper Kirby, by USF; provides for appropriation to compensate them for damages sustained due to negligence of employee of USF; limits payment of attorney's fees & costs. CLAIM WITH APPROPRIATION:
Title
Relief/Kirby/University of South Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2 -HJ 618 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 04/13/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 21 | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0326 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/179 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0179/BillText/Filed/HTML |