FL H0169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-12 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides legislative findings & intent; provides for retroactive application; specifies that once prima facie claim of self-defense immunity has been raised, burden of proof shall be on party seeking to overcome immunity from criminal prosecution; entitles criminal defendants who successfully claim such immunity to award of specified costs, attorney fees, & related expenses; specifies procedure for reimbursement requests; requires reimbursements to be paid from operating trust fund of state attorney who prosecuted defendant; limits amount of award.
Title
Use or Threatened Use of Defensive Force
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Rep. Neil Combee [R] | Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
Rep. Charlie Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Unfavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee, laid on Table; YEAS 6 NAYS 6 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-09-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0344 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
939 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |