FL H0163 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from sales & use tax sale of diapers & baby wipes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Exemption for Personal Hygiene Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Ways and Means Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-09-26HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Appropriations Committee 23
2017-09-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S56 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback