FL H0157 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides certain educational opportunities for specified local government employees; authorizes use of fee waivers for specified local government employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educ. and Training Opportunities/Public Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 20
2011-01-25 Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 20
2011-01-10 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0800 () 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 285
S0836 () 2011-03-24 - Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 285

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1101099Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback