FL H0155 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abrogates scheduled repeal of state saltwater reptile & state horse designations; designates Florida Cracker Cattle as official state heritage cattle breed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Symbols

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#595 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-43
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for SB 404
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time 570
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-09-26HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-09-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S404 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 155

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
150386Amended CodeSee Bill Text
150526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
150527Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback