FL H0153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires animal rescue organizations to prepare, maintain, & make available for public inspection & dissemination certain records; provides for sterilization of dogs & cats sold or released for adoption from shelters, organizations, & agencies; prohibits shelters, organizations, agencies, & individuals from importing animals into this state; provides exceptions; requires Commissioner of Agriculture to report certain violations & bring certain actions; provides penalties.
Title
Animals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-09-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S132 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
823 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
828 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/153 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/153/BillText/Filed/PDF |