FL H0153 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exceptions to excess credit hour surcharge requirement for certain students & under certain circumstances.
Title
Excess Credit Hour Surcharges
Sponsors
House Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
Rep. Paul Renner [R] | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Education Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-10 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-08 | House | CS by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 03/08/17, 12:00 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1462 (Same As) 2017-04-13 - Withdrawn from further consideration