FL H0149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes adult child who was under the care of a legal parental guardian at the time of a parent's death to file medical negligence claim under certain circumstances; authorizes legal parental guardian of adult child to file claim for medical negligence under certain circumstances.
Title
Medical Negligence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S514 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/149 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/149/BillText/Filed/PDF |