FL H0149 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 850; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2010-206) -HJ 01168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 850; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2010-206) -HJ 01168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Florida Industrial & Phosphate Research Institute within University of South Florida Polytechnic; creates Phosphate Research Activities Board; provides requirements & authorities for specified studies, & public access to certain phosphate-related information & activities; provides for type two transfer of Florida Industrial & Phosphate Research Institute to University of South Florida Polytechnic.
Title
Florida Industrial & Phosphate Research Institute
Sponsors
Rep. Seth McKeel [R] | Rep. John Wood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 850; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2010-206) -HJ 01168 | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 00358 | |
2010-03-19 | CS read 1st time on 03/19/10 -HJ 00348; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-17 | CS/CS/CS by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00352 | |
2010-03-15 | On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-12 | CS read 1st time on 03/12/10 -HJ 00270; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00279 | |
2010-03-10 | CS/CS by State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00273 | |
2010-03-08 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED), 03/10/10, 3:00 pm, 12-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Economic Development Policy (EDCA); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00021; On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall; CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00168; CS read 1st time on 03/02/10 -HJ 00156; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20; Original reference(s) removed: Economic Development Policy (EDCA); CS referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00163; Now in State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00163 | |
2010-02-09 | Original reference(s) removed: Economic Development Policy (EDCA); CS referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); General Government Policy Council; Now in State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED) | |
2010-02-05 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-02-03 | CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 02/03/10, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall | |
2009-10-23 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Economic Development Policy (EDCA); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); General Government Policy Council | |
2009-09-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0850 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-206
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0211 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0378 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0378 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 346 | New Code | See Bill Text |